Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Gherardi

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1686BornBorgo S. Seplocro
21 Mar 172134.7Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 172640.4AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
26 Dec 172640.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
5 Apr 175467.7DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Gherardi:
Bishop Luigi Gherardi (born , died ) Bishop of Cortona

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013