Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Todone

Deceased

Bishop of Asti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1662BornNizza
6 Jun 170542.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 172764.6AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
6 Jul 172764.6Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy
5 Mar 173976.3DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Todone:
Bishop Giovanni Todone (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 102
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1727, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015