Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimundo Rubí, O. Cart. †

Deceased

Bishop of Catania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1665³BornBarcelona, Spain
17 Dec 168924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Carthusian Order
9 Mar 172761.4SelectedBishop of Catania, Italy
26 Nov 172762.1ConfirmedBishop of Catania, Italy
8 Dec 172762.1Ordained BishopBishop of Catania, Italy
20 Jan 172963.3DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raimundo Rubí:
Bishop Raimundo Rubí O. Cart. (born , died ) Bishop of Catania

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 45, Number 176
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 151

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013