Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Saverio Albini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Athenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1678BornBenevento
21 Dec 172648.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 172748.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
3 Feb 172748.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
8 Jan 173152.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
11 Apr 174061.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Athenae

MicroData Summary for Nicola Saverio Albini:
Archbishop Nicola Saverio Albini (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Athenae

  • a priest for 13.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 243
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015