Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Alessio de’ Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1674Born
17 Mar 169622.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Mar 169723.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 173157.1AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
15 Apr 173157.2Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
6 Jan 174974.9DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Alessio de’ Rossi
Bishop Tommaso Alessio de’ Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Teramo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNardo

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1742
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast