Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Troiano Cardinal Acquaviva d’Aragona

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1696BornNaples
17 Apr 172933.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 172933.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Philippopolis in Arabia
3 May 172933.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philippopolis in Arabia
14 Aug 173034.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
1 Oct 173236.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 Nov 173236.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
19 Jan 173337.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
4 May 173943.3AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
20 Mar 174751.2DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Troiano Acquaviva d’Aragona:
Cardinal Troiano Acquaviva d’Aragona (born , died ) Archbishop of Monreale

  • a priest for 17.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
  • a cardinal for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Oct 1732
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013