Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura Sculco

Deceased

Bishop of Bisignano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1708Born
4 Jun 173526.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 174536.9AppointedBishop of Bisignano, Italy
27 Jun 174536.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bisignano, Italy
20 Sep 178173.1DiedBishop of Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Sculco
Bishop Bonaventura Sculco (born , died ) Bishop of Bisignano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCotrona

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,757
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,745, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast