Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felix Solazzo Castriotta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bisignano, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Thebae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1680Born
17 May 170524.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 May 170524.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 172140.6AppointedBishop of Bisignano, Italy
27 Jul 172140.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bisignano, Italy
18 Jun 174564.5ResignedBishop of Bisignano, Italy
21 Jun 174564.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
9 Mar 175574.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felix Solazzo Castriotta
Archbishop Felix Solazzo Castriotta (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bisignano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoriolan

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 120
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 400
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 29
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1744

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast