Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ubaldo Baldassini, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jesi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1700³BornJesi
23 Dec 172424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
16 Sep 175453.7AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
29 Sep 175453.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
9 Apr 176463.3AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
2 Feb 178685.1DiedBishop of Jesi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ubaldo Baldassini:
Bishop Ubaldo Baldassini B. (born , died ) Bishop of Jesi

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 68, and Page 113

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013