Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolino Pace

Deceased

Bishop of Vico Equense, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1717Born
19 Sep 173922.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
24 Sep 174023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
27 Apr 176850.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nicastro, Italy
10 May 177355.8AppointedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
Jun 1773³55.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
14 Apr 179274.8DiedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolino Pace
Bishop Paolino Pace (born , died ) Bishop of Vico Equense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMormanno

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 306, and Page 440
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast