Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pompeo Compagnoni

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1693BornMacerata
Sep 1740³47.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 174047.5AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
2 Oct 174047.5Ordained BishopBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
25 Jul 177481.3DiedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pompeo Compagnoni
Bishop Pompeo Compagnoni (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 109
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1740, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Nov 2016