Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Saverio Cardinal Gentili

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1681BornRoma, Italy
1 Jan 172442.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 172746.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
23 Mar 172746.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
Apr 1728³47.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Council
Sep 1728³47.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
1731¹49.8ResignedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
24 Sep 173150.6Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 173150.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
Oct 1736³55.6AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of the Council
20 Mar 173756.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
10 Apr 174766.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
13 Mar 175372.0DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Saverio Gentili:
Antonio Saverio Cardinal Gentili (born , died ) Prefect of Council

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
  • a cardinal for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1731
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 312
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015