Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippus de Amato

Deceased

Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1680BornAiello
7 Mar 170524.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Sep 173150.7AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
16 Sep 173150.8Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
3 Aug 173251.6DiedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy

MicroData Summary for Philippus de Amato:
Bishop Philippus de Amato (born , died ) Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)

  • a priest for 27.4 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 425

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015