Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Abbondio Battiloro

Deceased

Bishop of Alife


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1677³BornArpino
23 Apr 170224.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 172446.5AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
16 Jul 1724³46.6Ordained BishopBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
18 Dec 173356.0AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
17 Oct 173557.8DiedBishop of Alife, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Abbondio Battiloro:
Bishop Pietro Abbondio Battiloro (born , died ) Bishop of Alife

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 215
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 77
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015