Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Januarius Guglielmini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tropea

Titular Archbishop of Tarsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1674BornNapoli
22 Dec 170329.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 173157.2AppointedBishop of Tropea, Italy
30 Dec 173157.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tropea, Italy
12 Mar 175176.5ResignedBishop of Tropea, Italy
5 Jul 175176.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
20 Mar 176085.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Tropea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Januarius Guglielmini:
Archbishop Januarius Guglielmini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tropea

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013