Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Isidoro Persico

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1682BornNapoli
21 Mar 171128.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Sep 171129.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 172643.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirina
22 Apr 172643.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirina
18 Jun 173149.0AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
May 1739³56.9DiedBishop of Isernia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Isidoro Persico:
Bishop Giuseppe Isidoro Persico (born , died May 1739) Bishop of Isernia

  • a priest for 27.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 222
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 246
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015