Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Fortunato

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1682BornNapoli
19 Dec 170523.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 172845.2SelectedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
6 Jul 172946.6ConfirmedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
31 Jul 172946.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
17 Aug 175168.7DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Fortunato:
Bishop Gennaro Fortunato (born , died ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 147
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015