Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Fabrizio de Capua

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1685Born
6 Apr 172741.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 172742.1SelectedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
22 Dec 172742.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
27 Dec 172742.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
16 Sep 173045.4SelectedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
11 Dec 173045.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
1 Mar 173852.8DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Fabrizio de Capua
Archbishop Giovanni Fabrizio de Capua (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasal di Portici

  • a priest for 10.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 368
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018