Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Rivarola

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1683Born
19 Dec 171633.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 173047.5AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
21 Dec 173047.5Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
31 Dec 174562.5DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Rivarola
Bishop Agostino Rivarola (born , died ) Bishop of Albenga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 73
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,730, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast