Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Riccardo Ferniani

Deceased

Bishop of Perugia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1686³BornFaenza
1 Jun 171629.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
1717¹30.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 173044.2AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
25 Feb 173144.4Ordained BishopBishop of Perugia, Italy
25 Aug 176275.9DiedBishop of Perugia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Riccardo Ferniani:
Bishop Francesco Riccardo Ferniani (born , died ) Bishop of Perugia

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 333
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015