Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Camillo Cardinal Cibo (Cybo)

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1681BornMassa, Italy
5 Jul 170524.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 171836.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
24 Feb 171836.8Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
23 Mar 172947.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Mar 172947.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
8 Jan 173149.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
20 Dec 174160.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
12 Jan 174361.7DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli

MicroData Summary for Camillo Cibo (Cybo):
Cardinal Camillo Cibo (Cybo) (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
  • a cardinal for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Mar 1729

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013