Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Tosti

Deceased

Bishop of Minori


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1672BornMola di Gaeta
12 Sep 170027.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 171946.1AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
24 Feb 171946.2Ordained BishopBishop of Minori, Italy
Mar 172249.2DiedBishop of Minori, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Tosti:
Bishop Raffaele Tosti (born ) Bishop of Minori

  • a priest for 21.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1721
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013