Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Crisostomo Battelli

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Amasea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1658Born
14 Apr 169133.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 171658.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amasea
11 Oct 171658.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amasea
30 Jul 172567.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Amasea

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Crisostomo Battelli
Archbishop Giovanni Crisostomo Battelli (born Mar 1658, died ) Titular Archbishop of Amasea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassocorvaro

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 80
  • c34: CB, 27 May 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 26
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,447

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018