Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco Leonini

Deceased

Bishop of San Severino (Marche)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1660BornRoma
29 Jan 170241.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 172161.2AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
5 Oct 172161.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
16 Jan 172564.5DiedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Leonini:
Bishop Giovanni Francesco Leonini (born , died ) Bishop of San Severino (Marche)

  • a priest for 22.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 356
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015