Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Girolamo Mattei

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Fermo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1672BornMontenerodomo, Italy
12 Feb 170835.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Feb 170835.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 170835.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
21 Apr 170835.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
1 Oct 171037.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
2 Oct 171037.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
11 Oct 171037.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
21 Nov 171240.0AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
Nov 1713³40.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
2 Oct 172451.9ResignedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
25 Feb 174067.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Fermo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Mattei
Archbishop Girolamo Mattei (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Fermo

  • a priest for 31.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 202, and Page 282
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 288
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 15
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 250

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Nov 2016