Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Onofrio Pini

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1690BornOsimo
19 Dec 171626.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 172130.8AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
5 Oct 172130.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
Jun 1754³63.5DiedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Onofrio Pini:
Bishop Onofrio Pini (born , died Jun 1754) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015