Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gianfrancesco De’ Bisleti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Segni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1673BornVeroli
8 Sep 170632.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 172147.8AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
5 Oct 172147.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli, Italy
9 Dec 172653.0AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
12 Apr 174975.4ResignedBishop of Segni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gianfrancesco De’ Bisleti:
Bishop Gianfrancesco De’ Bisleti (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Segni

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1749
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 137, and Page 357
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015