Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Dolfi

Deceased

Bishop of Fano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1655Born
9 Nov 168732.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Nov 168732.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 172166.4AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
27 Jul 172166.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fano, Italy
14 Aug 173378.5DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Dolfi
Bishop Alessandro Dolfi (born , died ) Bishop of Fano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1732
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 198
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018