Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Conus Luchini dal Verme

Deceased

Bishop of Ostuni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1675³BornDiani
7 May 170226.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 May 170226.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 171943.6AppointedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
12 Mar 171943.7Ordained BishopBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
16 Dec 172045.5AppointedBishop of Ostuni, Italy
12 Apr 174771.8DiedBishop of Ostuni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Conus Luchini dal Verme:
Bishop Conus Luchini dal Verme (born , died ) Bishop of Ostuni

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1732
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 207, and Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015