Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Antonio Pietrasanta, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1657BornMilano
21 Sep 168023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
14 Mar 171861.1AppointedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
19 Mar 171861.1Ordained BishopBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
Oct 1727³70.6DiedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Antonio Pietrasanta:
Bishop Pietro Antonio Pietrasanta B. (born , died Oct 1727) Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum)

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 259
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015