Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Kacich

Deceased

Archbishop of Split (Spalato)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1686³BornMakarska
14 Jun 171024.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 172135.5AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
28 Dec 172135.5Ordained BishopBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
18 Dec 173044.5AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
7 Oct 174559.3DiedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Kacich:
Archbishop Antoine Kacich (born , died ) Archbishop of Split (Spalato)

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 384
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1721, Number 47
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 385

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015