Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Priuli

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1669Born
17 May 170637.1Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 170637.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
14 May 170839.1AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
29 May 170839.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 170839.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bergamo, Italy
6 May 172051.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Marco
22 Jan 172858.8DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Priuli (VIAF: 89065997)
Pietro Cardinal Priuli (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained PriestGes¨, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopPauline Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo

  • a priest for 19.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
  • a cardinal for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706
  • c3+: CB
  • c34: CB, 3 Jun 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1708, Number 9
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,435
  • c1: AT, 20 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 20 Dec 2020

Quantcast