Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Emmanuel-Theódose Cardinal de la Tour d’Auvergne de Bouillon

Deceased

Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1643BornTurenne, France
5 Aug 166925.9Elevated to Cardinal
19 May 167026.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
19 Oct 167633.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
19 Oct 168946.2AppointedBishop of Albano, Italy
19 Oct 168946.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
20 Nov 168946.2Ordained BishopBishop of Albano, Italy
21 Jul 169854.9AppointedBishop of Porto e Santa Rufina, Italy
21 Jul 169854.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
15 Dec 170057.3AppointedBishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
15 Dec 170057.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
2 Mar 171571.5DiedBishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel-Theódose de la Tour d’Auvergne de Bouillon:
Cardinal Emmanuel-Theódose de la Tour d’Auvergne de Bouillon (born , died ) Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

  • a bishop for 25.3 years
  • a cardinal for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Aug 1669

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013