Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Dalla Rosa

Deceased

Bishop of Borgo San Donnino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1642BornParma
6 Jun 166623.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 169855.8AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
25 Jul 169855.8Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
31 Dec 169957.2DiedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Dalla Rosa:
Bishop Giulio Dalla Rosa (born , died ) Bishop of Borgo San Donnino

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013