Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Andrea Balbi

Deceased

Bishop of Pula (Pola)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1692³BornKrk
6 Oct 172028.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 172836.2AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
20 Jun 172836.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
21 Jul 173240.3AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
Oct 1771³79.5DiedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Andrea Balbi:
Bishop Giovanni Andrea Balbi (born , died Oct 1771) Bishop of Pula (Pola)

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 292
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 342
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1728, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015