Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vincenzo Ludovico Cardinal Gotti, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1664BornBologna, Italy
1680²15.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1688²23.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
29 Apr 172863.6AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
30 Apr 172863.6Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 172863.6Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
14 Jun 172863.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
26 Sep 173874.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
18 Sep 174278.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Ludovico Gotti (VIAF: 25383044)
Vincenzo Ludovico Cardinal Gotti O.P. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
  • a cardinal for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Apr 1728
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 28
  • c1: CB, 2 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Nov 2016