Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Torelli

Deceased

Bishop of Forli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1673³BornForli
1 Nov 171441.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Nov 171441.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 171441.8AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
25 Nov 171441.8Ordained BishopBishop of Forli, Italy
24 Apr 176087.2DiedBishop of Forli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Torelli:
Bishop Tommaso Torelli (born , died ) Bishop of Forli

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 204
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015