Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio de Monroy, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1634BornSantiago de Querétaro, México
167742.5AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
4 Jun 168550.9AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
17 Jun 168550.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
168651.5ResignedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Nov 171581.3DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Monroy:
Archbishop Antonio de Monroy O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 30.4 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,448
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 227, Number 1,410

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013