Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Grassi

Deceased

Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1666Born
3 Apr 170639.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 171851.4AppointedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
19 Mar 171851.4Ordained BishopBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia
16 Mar 173164.4DiedBishop of Poreč (Parenzo), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Pietro Grassi
Bishop Pietro Grassi (born , died ) Bishop of Poreč (Parenzo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChioggia

  • a priest for 24.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 29
  • d: CB, 3 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018