Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-François Lafitau

Deceased

Bishop of Sisteron

Priest of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1685BornBordeaux
10 Sep 171328.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
23 Sep 171328.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
5 Nov 171934.7SelectedBishop of Sisteron, France
Mar 1720³35.0IncardinatedPriest
4 Mar 172035.0ConfirmedBishop of Sisteron, France
10 Mar 172035.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sisteron, France
5 Apr 176479.1DiedBishop of Sisteron, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-François Lafitau:
Bishop Pierre-François Lafitau (born , died ) Bishop of Sisteron

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 359
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015