Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonino Serafino Camarda, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1674³BornMessina
21 Sep 169722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Jun 172449.6AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
18 Jun 172449.6Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
24 May 175479.6DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonino Serafino Camarda:
Bishop Antonino Serafino Camarda O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Rieti

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1736
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 330
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015