Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Ferrero, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1658BornNapoli
4 Feb 167416.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1 Mar 168123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Apr 172567.2AppointedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
1 May 172567.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
8 Feb 173072.0AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
Oct 1733³75.7DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Ferrero:
Bishop Vincenzo Ferrero O.P. (born ) Bishop of Lucera

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 213, and Page 249
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013