Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hyacinthus Verdesca

Deceased

Bishop of Carinola (Calina)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1673BornS. Thomae in Parione
22 Sep 169623.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 173360.2AppointedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
11 Oct 173360.2Ordained BishopBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
Sep 174774.1DiedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy

MicroData Summary for Hyacinthus Verdesca:
Bishop Hyacinthus Verdesca Bishop of Carinola (Calina)

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013