Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Massenzio (dei Conti) Filo

Deceased

Bishop of Castellaneta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1691Born
20 Jan 172634.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Jan 172634.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 173342.0AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
17 May 173342.1Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
7 Sep 176372.4DiedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Massenzio (dei Conti) Filo
Bishop Massenzio (dei Conti) Filo (born , died ) Bishop of Castellaneta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAltamura

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 153
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018