Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ippolito de Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1691BornParma
24 Feb 172534.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 173645.7AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
26 Sep 173645.7AppointedBishop of Fabriano, Italy
7 Oct 173645.7Ordained BishopBishop of Camerino, Italy
17 Jan 174655.0AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
21 Aug 177584.6DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ippolito de Rossi:
Bishop Ippolito de Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Senigallia

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013