Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Bonaventura Savini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

Titular Archbishop of Sebastea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1692Born
19 Nov 172432.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 173542.9AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
2 Oct 173542.9Ordained BishopBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
29 Aug 174855.8ResignedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
16 Sep 174855.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea

MicroData Summary for Pietro Bonaventura Savini
Archbishop Pietro Bonaventura Savini (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamerino

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 294, and Page 370
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018