Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Rotario da Pralormo (Rovero)

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1684BornPralormo
21 Mar 171126.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 172742.8AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
12 Oct 172742.9Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
3 Feb 174459.2AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
5 Apr 175671.4Elevated to Cardinal
2 Aug 175873.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
9 Oct 176681.9DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Rotario da Pralormo (Rovero):
Cardinal Giovanni Battista Rotario da Pralormo (Rovero) (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
  • a cardinal for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Apr 1756
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013