Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre Biord

Deceased

Bishop of Genève {Geneva}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1719BornSamoens
21 Dec 174324.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 176444.5SelectedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
9 Jul 176444.7ConfirmedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
12 Aug 176444.8Ordained BishopBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
14 Mar 178565.4DiedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Biord
Bishop Jean-Pierre Biord (born , died ) Bishop of Genève {Geneva}

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 224
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 5 Feb 2016