Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Melchior Joseph Zen-Ruffinen

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1729BornLeuk
18 Mar 175223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
26 May 178051.4SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
18 Sep 178051.7ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
12 Nov 178051.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
14 Jun 179061.4DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Franz Melchior Joseph Zen-Ruffinen:
Bishop Franz Melchior Joseph Zen-Ruffinen (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013