Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Saverio Ferrari

Deceased

Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1667Born
7 Mar 169325.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 172760.3AppointedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
14 Dec 172760.3Ordained BishopBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
29 Apr 173365.7DiedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy

MicroData Summary for Saverio Ferrari
Bishop Saverio Ferrari (born , died ) Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSquillace

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 48
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018